|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5264.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6217.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
June 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4542.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|