|
09/23/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 6962.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4346.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4300.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4605.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2018
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|