California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB969 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2018

Amended

Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018