|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 842, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6058.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6758.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5013.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4722.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|