California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB972 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 20, 2018
Bill May 15, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018
Bill March 5, 2018