Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4301.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4814.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4604.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|