|
09/21/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5859.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6580.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4970.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
April 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|