LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA1
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA1
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA1
Action History
Senate
06/27/2017
June 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 1754.)
Senate
06/02/2017
Set for hearing June 26.
Senate
01/12/2017
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and E. & C.A.
Senate
12/06/2016
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
Senate
12/05/2016
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.