LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA16
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA16
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA16
Action History
Senate
04/04/2018
April 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 4534.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
03/06/2018
Set for hearing April 4.
Senate
03/01/2018
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
Senate
02/20/2018
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
Senate
02/16/2018
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.