Senate | 08/16/2018 | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/10/2018 | Set for hearing August 16. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2018 | May 25 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 5061.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4812.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |