Senate | 08/16/2018 | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/10/2018 | Set for hearing August 16. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2018 | May 25 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Set for hearing May 25. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 5061.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4996.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |