LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA8
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA8
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA8
Action History
Senate
08/14/2018
August 13 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 5314.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
06/20/2017
June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
06/02/2017
Set for hearing June 26.
Senate
02/23/2017
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and E. & C.A.
Senate
02/16/2017
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
Senate
02/15/2017
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.