Senate | 04/17/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4647.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4446.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |