Senate | 08/15/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2018 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5238.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 6065.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4634.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |