Senate
|
07/06/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6033.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4225.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4905.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2018
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|