Senate | 08/30/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2017 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2232.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2017 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2017 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1605.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | From inactive file. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |