Senate | 04/25/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4789.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4543.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |