Senate | 07/06/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6034.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2018 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4349.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | From consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | Set for hearing May 14. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4905.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |