1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 129 CHAPTER 67 Relative to Aviation Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 15, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 129, Fuller. Aviation Awareness Month.This measure would designate the month of April 2018 as Aviation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, General aviation in America supports more than 1.1 million jobs, many of them in small and medium-sized businesses, and generates $219 billion in total economic output; andWHEREAS, Many of the over 5,100 general aviation airports in the United States are located within a close proximity to small and medium-sized businesses and communities that are driving the nations economic recovery; andWHEREAS, Private aircraft that help these businesses create and maintain jobs have been mistakenly characterized as toys for the rich, rather than as vital tools that allow business to operate and thrive; andWHEREAS, General aviation aircraft are used around the clock by law enforcement officers, medical professionals, disaster relief personnel, and others to reach people in need; andWHEREAS, General aviation aircraft are also used by researchers to gather data and map terrain in order to help governments, businesses, and nongovernmental organizations improve and protect the quality of life; andWHEREAS, Americas agricultural industry uses general aviation in its efforts to feed and clothe a hungry world; andWHEREAS, The nations public utilities use general aviation to install and maintain infrastructure vital to the nation; andWHEREAS, Insufficient funding of Federal Aviation Administration operations and airport and airspace infrastructure imposes challenges on the ability of general aviation operators to operate effectively; andWHEREAS, General aviation faces increasing and onerous security regulations; andWHEREAS, Planning and zoning requirements and urban encroachment contribute to reducing the number and availability of airports throughout California and the United States, which annually reduces the number of airports available to public and private users; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the vital role general aviation plays in the economy, health, safety, and protection of the nation, and abstains from legislation and policies that impact this industrys ability to continue to function effectively, and therefore recognizes the month of April 2018 as Aviation Awareness Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 11, 2018 Passed IN Senate April 26, 2018 Passed IN Assembly May 10, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 129Introduced by Senator Fuller(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Bates, Cannella, Dodd, Gaines, Roth, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Chvez, Choi, Lackey, Mathis, Obernolte, Patterson, and Salas)April 04, 2018 Relative to Aviation Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 129, Fuller. Aviation Awareness Month.This measure would designate the month of April 2018 as Aviation Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, General aviation in America supports more than 1.1 million jobs, many of them in small and medium-sized businesses, and generates $219 billion in total economic output; andWHEREAS, Many of the over 5,100 general aviation airports in the United States are located within a close proximity to small and medium-sized businesses and communities that are driving the nations economic recovery; andWHEREAS, Private aircraft that help these businesses create and maintain jobs have been mistakenly characterized as toys for the rich, rather than as vital tools that allow business to operate and thrive; andWHEREAS, General aviation aircraft are used around the clock by law enforcement officers, medical professionals, disaster relief personnel, and others to reach people in need; andWHEREAS, General aviation aircraft are also used by researchers to gather data and map terrain in order to help governments, businesses, and nongovernmental organizations improve and protect the quality of life; andWHEREAS, Americas agricultural industry uses general aviation in its efforts to feed and clothe a hungry world; andWHEREAS, The nations public utilities use general aviation to install and maintain infrastructure vital to the nation; andWHEREAS, Insufficient funding of Federal Aviation Administration operations and airport and airspace infrastructure imposes challenges on the ability of general aviation operators to operate effectively; andWHEREAS, General aviation faces increasing and onerous security regulations; andWHEREAS, Planning and zoning requirements and urban encroachment contribute to reducing the number and availability of airports throughout California and the United States, which annually reduces the number of airports available to public and private users; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the vital role general aviation plays in the economy, health, safety, and protection of the nation, and abstains from legislation and policies that impact this industrys ability to continue to function effectively, and therefore recognizes the month of April 2018 as Aviation Awareness Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|