California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR131 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 131 CHAPTER 86 Relative to CASA Appreciation Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 05, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 131, Newman. CASA Appreciation Day.This measure would declare May 14, 2018, as CASA Appreciation Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, All children have the right to a home with loving people to care for them, but each year in the United States, children are abused, neglected, or abandoned by their families. These children are removed from their homes, placed in foster care or institutions, and eventually end up in court; andWHEREAS, A judge has the power to decide the future for these children and whether they should remain in foster care, be reunited with parents, or adopted, but in many cases, the children become victims for a second time, lost in an overburdened child welfare system that cannot pay close attention to each child; andWHEREAS, CASA Appreciation Day recognizes the important role played by Court Appointed Special Advocate for children (CASA) volunteers. These trained community volunteers are appointed by a judge as officers of the court to speak up for children in juvenile court and to help humanize the often frightening and confusing child welfare and legal systems for these children; andWHEREAS, Eighty thousand of Californias children are in foster care because they have been abused, neglected, or abandoned. CASA volunteers play an important role in their lives by getting to know a foster care child and letting the judge and others in the child welfare system know about the childs perspective and needs; andWHEREAS, The CASA mission is to ensure consistency and support for children in the foster care system through the use of volunteer advocates advancing the best interests of each child; andWHEREAS, The CASA vision is one where every child in need is appointed a CASA volunteer to champion him or her in court, without compromise, on the path to a safe and permanent home; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares that May 14, 2018, is recognized as CASA Appreciation Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled June 01, 2018 Passed IN Senate May 14, 2018 Passed IN Assembly May 30, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 131Introduced by Senator NewmanApril 09, 2018 Relative to CASA Appreciation Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 131, Newman. CASA Appreciation Day.This measure would declare May 14, 2018, as CASA Appreciation Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, All children have the right to a home with loving people to care for them, but each year in the United States, children are abused, neglected, or abandoned by their families. These children are removed from their homes, placed in foster care or institutions, and eventually end up in court; andWHEREAS, A judge has the power to decide the future for these children and whether they should remain in foster care, be reunited with parents, or adopted, but in many cases, the children become victims for a second time, lost in an overburdened child welfare system that cannot pay close attention to each child; andWHEREAS, CASA Appreciation Day recognizes the important role played by Court Appointed Special Advocate for children (CASA) volunteers. These trained community volunteers are appointed by a judge as officers of the court to speak up for children in juvenile court and to help humanize the often frightening and confusing child welfare and legal systems for these children; andWHEREAS, Eighty thousand of Californias children are in foster care because they have been abused, neglected, or abandoned. CASA volunteers play an important role in their lives by getting to know a foster care child and letting the judge and others in the child welfare system know about the childs perspective and needs; andWHEREAS, The CASA mission is to ensure consistency and support for children in the foster care system through the use of volunteer advocates advancing the best interests of each child; andWHEREAS, The CASA vision is one where every child in need is appointed a CASA volunteer to champion him or her in court, without compromise, on the path to a safe and permanent home; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares that May 14, 2018, is recognized as CASA Appreciation Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 131 CHAPTER 86 Relative to CASA Appreciation Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 05, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 131, Newman. CASA Appreciation Day.This measure would declare May 14, 2018, as CASA Appreciation Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled June 01, 2018 Passed IN Senate May 14, 2018 Passed IN Assembly May 30, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 131Introduced by Senator NewmanApril 09, 2018 Relative to CASA Appreciation Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 131, Newman. CASA Appreciation Day.This measure would declare May 14, 2018, as CASA Appreciation Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled June 01, 2018 Passed IN Senate May 14, 2018 Passed IN Assembly May 30, 2018
6+
7+Enrolled June 01, 2018
8+Passed IN Senate May 14, 2018
9+Passed IN Assembly May 30, 2018
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 131
6-CHAPTER 86
14+
15+Introduced by Senator NewmanApril 09, 2018
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Newman
18+April 09, 2018
719
820 Relative to CASA Appreciation Day.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State June 05, 2018. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 131, Newman. CASA Appreciation Day.
1727
1828 This measure would declare May 14, 2018, as CASA Appreciation Day in California.
1929
2030 This measure would declare May 14, 2018, as CASA Appreciation Day in California.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, All children have the right to a home with loving people to care for them, but each year in the United States, children are abused, neglected, or abandoned by their families. These children are removed from their homes, placed in foster care or institutions, and eventually end up in court; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, A judge has the power to decide the future for these children and whether they should remain in foster care, be reunited with parents, or adopted, but in many cases, the children become victims for a second time, lost in an overburdened child welfare system that cannot pay close attention to each child; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, CASA Appreciation Day recognizes the important role played by Court Appointed Special Advocate for children (CASA) volunteers. These trained community volunteers are appointed by a judge as officers of the court to speak up for children in juvenile court and to help humanize the often frightening and confusing child welfare and legal systems for these children; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, Eighty thousand of Californias children are in foster care because they have been abused, neglected, or abandoned. CASA volunteers play an important role in their lives by getting to know a foster care child and letting the judge and others in the child welfare system know about the childs perspective and needs; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, The CASA mission is to ensure consistency and support for children in the foster care system through the use of volunteer advocates advancing the best interests of each child; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, The CASA vision is one where every child in need is appointed a CASA volunteer to champion him or her in court, without compromise, on the path to a safe and permanent home; now, therefore, be it
3747
3848 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares that May 14, 2018, is recognized as CASA Appreciation Day in California; and be it further
3949
4050 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.