Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 134 CHAPTER 65 Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 10, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 134, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would designate Monday, May 7, 2018, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Monday, May 7, 2018, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; andWHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; andWHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; andWHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; andWHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; andWHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic men and women who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2017:Officer Keith W. Boyer, Whittier Police Department, End of Watch: February 20, 2017.Officer Lucas F. Chellew, California Highway Patrol South Sacramento Area, End of Watch: February 22, 2017.Deputy Sheriff Jason A. Garner, Stanislaus County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: May 13, 2017.Deputy Sheriff Robert P. Rumfelt, Lake County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: August 22, 2017.Deputy Sheriff Robert A. French, Sacramento County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: August 30, 2017.Officer Andrew J. Camilleri, Sr., California Highway Patrol Hayward Area, End of Watch: December 24, 2017; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled:Officer Murray F. Olsen, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: March 9, 1975.Officer Louis Allinson, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: March 27, 1915; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 7, 2018, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 134 CHAPTER 65 Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 10, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 134, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day.This measure would designate Monday, May 7, 2018, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 134 CHAPTER 65 Relative to California Peace Officers Memorial Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 10, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 134, Galgiani. California Peace Officers Memorial Day. This measure would designate Monday, May 7, 2018, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities. This measure would designate Monday, May 7, 2018, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, urge all Californians to use that day to honor California peace officers, and recognize specified California peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Monday, May 7, 2018, is California Peace Officers Memorial Day, a day Californians observe in commemoration of those noble officers who have tragically sacrificed their lives in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Although California citizens are indebted to our California peace officers each day of the week, we make particular note of their bravery and dedication and we share in their losses on California Peace Officers Memorial Day; and WHEREAS, California peace officers have a job second in importance to none, and it is a job that is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, The peace officers of California have worked dutifully and selflessly on behalf of the people of this great state, regardless of the peril or hazard to themselves; and WHEREAS, By the enforcement of our laws, these same officers have safeguarded the lives and property of the citizens of California and have given their full measure to ensure these citizens the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, Special ceremonies and observations on behalf of California peace officers provide all Californians with the opportunity to appreciate the heroic men and women who have dedicated their lives to preserving public safety; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in 2017: Officer Keith W. Boyer, Whittier Police Department, End of Watch: February 20, 2017. Officer Lucas F. Chellew, California Highway Patrol South Sacramento Area, End of Watch: February 22, 2017. Deputy Sheriff Jason A. Garner, Stanislaus County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: May 13, 2017. Deputy Sheriff Robert P. Rumfelt, Lake County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: August 22, 2017. Deputy Sheriff Robert A. French, Sacramento County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: August 30, 2017. Officer Andrew J. Camilleri, Sr., California Highway Patrol Hayward Area, End of Watch: December 24, 2017; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature also recognizes Californias peace officers who were killed in defense of their communities in prior years, but not yet enrolled: Officer Murray F. Olsen, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: March 9, 1975. Officer Louis Allinson, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, End of Watch: March 27, 1915; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature designates Monday, May 7, 2018, as California Peace Officers Memorial Day, and urges all Californians to remember those individuals who have given their lives for our safety and express appreciation to those who continue to dedicate themselves to making California a safer place in which to live and raise our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.