Senate | 08/15/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6217.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4651.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |