1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 136 CHAPTER 87 Relative to Infrastructure Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 05, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 136, Newman. Infrastructure Week.This measure would recognize the week of May 14, 2018, to May 20, 2018, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The week of May 14, 2018, to May 20, 2018, inclusive, is being observed at the local, state, and national levels as the sixth annual Infrastructure Week; andWHEREAS, The people of California rely on critical infrastructure, such as roads and bridges, railroads and transit systems, ports and airports, waste and water systems, reliable power supplies, open spaces, and access to broadband; andWHEREAS, This infrastructure enhances the states local and regional economy, quality and enjoyment of life, safety, and the strength of communities; andWHEREAS, Decades of underfunding and deferred maintenance have pushed infrastructure across the state to the brink of crisis, with preventable failures occurring in some communities that impose financial costs to the public and government; andWHEREAS, California risks compromising its competitive advantage by failing to adequately invest in its infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Californias failure to invest in infrastructure systems is more than a drag on the economy, it can be harmful to health and safety, even though most tragedies resulting from infrastructure failures are preventable with adequate investment; andWHEREAS, Every dollar invested in infrastructure generates in excess of $2 in economic output and jobs; andWHEREAS, To grow Californias economy, keep people safe, strengthen communities, and preserve and protect the states green infrastructure and environment, all levels of government and the private sector need to work together to rebuild and repair critical infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week 2018 has been established to highlight infrastructure investment needs in communities throughout California, and to recognize and encourage leadership at the federal, state, and local levels to address the states pressing infrastructure challenges; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week challenges policymakers and the public to address the challenges facing green and traditional infrastructure, to move beyond short-term fixes and deferred maintenance, and to envision the innovative solutions, technologies, policies, and investments that will improve the states infrastructure today and in the future; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the week of May 14, 2018, to May 20, 2018, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and urges the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations; and be it further Resolved, That despite fiscal challenges, it is important for the Legislature to dedicate sufficient resources to transportation, infrastructure, and green investments in our community; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 01, 2018 Passed IN Senate May 17, 2018 Passed IN Assembly May 30, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 136Introduced by Senator NewmanApril 25, 2018 Relative to Infrastructure Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 136, Newman. Infrastructure Week.This measure would recognize the week of May 14, 2018, to May 20, 2018, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and would urge the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The week of May 14, 2018, to May 20, 2018, inclusive, is being observed at the local, state, and national levels as the sixth annual Infrastructure Week; andWHEREAS, The people of California rely on critical infrastructure, such as roads and bridges, railroads and transit systems, ports and airports, waste and water systems, reliable power supplies, open spaces, and access to broadband; andWHEREAS, This infrastructure enhances the states local and regional economy, quality and enjoyment of life, safety, and the strength of communities; andWHEREAS, Decades of underfunding and deferred maintenance have pushed infrastructure across the state to the brink of crisis, with preventable failures occurring in some communities that impose financial costs to the public and government; andWHEREAS, California risks compromising its competitive advantage by failing to adequately invest in its infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Californias failure to invest in infrastructure systems is more than a drag on the economy, it can be harmful to health and safety, even though most tragedies resulting from infrastructure failures are preventable with adequate investment; andWHEREAS, Every dollar invested in infrastructure generates in excess of $2 in economic output and jobs; andWHEREAS, To grow Californias economy, keep people safe, strengthen communities, and preserve and protect the states green infrastructure and environment, all levels of government and the private sector need to work together to rebuild and repair critical infrastructure; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week 2018 has been established to highlight infrastructure investment needs in communities throughout California, and to recognize and encourage leadership at the federal, state, and local levels to address the states pressing infrastructure challenges; andWHEREAS, Infrastructure Week challenges policymakers and the public to address the challenges facing green and traditional infrastructure, to move beyond short-term fixes and deferred maintenance, and to envision the innovative solutions, technologies, policies, and investments that will improve the states infrastructure today and in the future; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the week of May 14, 2018, to May 20, 2018, inclusive, as Infrastructure Week, and urges the citizens of California to join in this special observance with appropriate events and commemorations; and be it further Resolved, That despite fiscal challenges, it is important for the Legislature to dedicate sufficient resources to transportation, infrastructure, and green investments in our community; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|