Senate | 05/29/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 5212.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4967.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |