Senate | 06/27/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4333.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |