Senate | 06/05/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5564.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5080.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |