Assembly | 08/21/2018 | Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2018 | August 21 hearing: Failed passage in committee. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 5028.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2018 | Set for hearing June 25. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4510.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Set for hearing June 6. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |