Senate | 06/21/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5822.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4261.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |