Senate | 09/11/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 229, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6922.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5695.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |