Senate | 09/04/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 6476.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 9). | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 4824.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |