Senate | 08/24/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6314.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 9). | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5042.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |