Senate | 09/04/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 185, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6518.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 16). | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5165.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2018 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |