Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6736.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
August 23 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6480.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5571.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
Set for hearing August 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 5315.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|