1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 160 CHAPTER 235 Relative to California Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 11, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 160, McGuire. Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim October 13, 2018, as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day, and requests the citizens of California, on that day, to become informed and aware of this disease.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Thousands of families across California are affected by metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, There has been tremendous progress in the last 30 years related to early detection and routine diagnosis of breast cancer; andWHEREAS, In contrast, there has not been as much progress related to the treatment of advanced breast cancer, also referred to as metastatic breast cancer. Metastatic breast cancer patients continue to face many unique challenges, such as the emotional and physical demands of treatment. This devastating stage of breast cancer occurs when cancer spreads beyond the breast to other parts of the body, including, but not limited to, the bones, lungs, liver, and brain; andWHEREAS, As of today, no cure exists for metastatic breast cancer, and those with metastatic breast cancer may continue treatment with the goal of extending the best possible quality of life; andWHEREAS, More than one in eight women in the United States will be diagnosed with metastatic breast cancer in their lifetime. In California, it is estimated that 29,360 women will be diagnosed with breast cancer in 2018; andWHEREAS, In the United States, it is estimated that more than 154,000 women have metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, In 2018, it is estimated that more than 4,500 women in California will die from breast cancer, and nearly all cases will involve metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, Metastatic breast cancer affects all races and socioeconomic classes. The greatest incidence of breast cancer occurs in white women, but the mortality rate related to the disease is higher for African American women, and breast cancer is the leading cause of cancer-related death for Latina women; and WHEREAS, Discussions of breast cancer should include a spectrum of issues, including, but not limited to, screening, treatment, and support of patients with metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, For patients, and families, the health and economic burdens of metastatic breast cancer are substantial; andWHEREAS, Metastatic breast cancer cuts short the lives of too many people in California, and leaves a lasting effect on families; andWHEREAS, Metastatic breast cancer remains incurable, but there is hope. Extensive research efforts are underway to address this disease; andWHEREAS, Clinicaltrials.gov is a searchable database that provides patients, family members, and the public with information about current, ongoing clinical research studies; andWHEREAS, Additional research efforts are needed on topics related to the personal and social burdens of metastatic breast cancer, the needs of the patient, and the development of new and more effective treatments; andWHEREAS, Observation of Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day sheds light on the devastation that metastatic breast cancer brings to communities throughout California; andWHEREAS, Individuals diagnosed with metastatic breast cancer can speak with their physicians to learn more about the disease, and to find support groups either in their communities or online; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims October 13, 2018, as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day, and requests the residents of California, on that day, to become informed and aware of metastatic breast cancer; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled September 04, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 16, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 28, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 160Introduced by Senator McGuire(Principal coauthors: Senators Anderson, Atkins, Bates, Chang, De Len, Dodd, Fuller, Galgiani, Hertzberg, Jackson, Leyva, Mitchell, Nguyen, Nielsen, Pan, Skinner, and Wiener)August 06, 2018 Relative to California Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 160, McGuire. Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim October 13, 2018, as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day, and requests the citizens of California, on that day, to become informed and aware of this disease.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Thousands of families across California are affected by metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, There has been tremendous progress in the last 30 years related to early detection and routine diagnosis of breast cancer; andWHEREAS, In contrast, there has not been as much progress related to the treatment of advanced breast cancer, also referred to as metastatic breast cancer. Metastatic breast cancer patients continue to face many unique challenges, such as the emotional and physical demands of treatment. This devastating stage of breast cancer occurs when cancer spreads beyond the breast to other parts of the body, including, but not limited to, the bones, lungs, liver, and brain; andWHEREAS, As of today, no cure exists for metastatic breast cancer, and those with metastatic breast cancer may continue treatment with the goal of extending the best possible quality of life; andWHEREAS, More than one in eight women in the United States will be diagnosed with metastatic breast cancer in their lifetime. In California, it is estimated that 29,360 women will be diagnosed with breast cancer in 2018; andWHEREAS, In the United States, it is estimated that more than 154,000 women have metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, In 2018, it is estimated that more than 4,500 women in California will die from breast cancer, and nearly all cases will involve metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, Metastatic breast cancer affects all races and socioeconomic classes. The greatest incidence of breast cancer occurs in white women, but the mortality rate related to the disease is higher for African American women, and breast cancer is the leading cause of cancer-related death for Latina women; and WHEREAS, Discussions of breast cancer should include a spectrum of issues, including, but not limited to, screening, treatment, and support of patients with metastatic breast cancer; andWHEREAS, For patients, and families, the health and economic burdens of metastatic breast cancer are substantial; andWHEREAS, Metastatic breast cancer cuts short the lives of too many people in California, and leaves a lasting effect on families; andWHEREAS, Metastatic breast cancer remains incurable, but there is hope. Extensive research efforts are underway to address this disease; andWHEREAS, Clinicaltrials.gov is a searchable database that provides patients, family members, and the public with information about current, ongoing clinical research studies; andWHEREAS, Additional research efforts are needed on topics related to the personal and social burdens of metastatic breast cancer, the needs of the patient, and the development of new and more effective treatments; andWHEREAS, Observation of Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day sheds light on the devastation that metastatic breast cancer brings to communities throughout California; andWHEREAS, Individuals diagnosed with metastatic breast cancer can speak with their physicians to learn more about the disease, and to find support groups either in their communities or online; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims October 13, 2018, as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day, and requests the residents of California, on that day, to become informed and aware of metastatic breast cancer; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|