1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 164 CHAPTER 237 Relative to National Health Center Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 11, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 164, Portantino. National Health Center Week.This measure would proclaim the week of August 12, 2018, to August 18, 2018, inclusive, as National Health Center Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For over 50 years, community health centers have delivered value to, and have had a significant impact on, Americas health care system by providing high-quality, affordable, and comprehensive primary and preventive health care in our nations underserved communities; andWHEREAS, As the countrys largest primary care network, health centers are the home for 27 million Americans in over 10,000 communities across the nation. One in every 12 people in the United States and one in every six Californians are served by community health centers; andWHEREAS, Health centers are a critical element of the health care system, serving both rural and urban populations, and often providing the only accessible and dependable source of primary care in their communities. Nationwide, health centers serve one in every six residents of rural areas; andWHEREAS, Every day, health centers develop new approaches to integrating a wide range of services beyond primary care to meet the needs and challenges of their communities, including oral health, vision care, behavioral health, and pharmacy services; andWHEREAS, Health centers are governed by patient-majority boards, ensuring that the patients of each health center are engaged in their own health care decisions; andWHEREAS, Health centers are locally owned and operated small businesses that serve as critical economic engines, helping to power local economies by generating $45.6 billion in economic impact in some of the countrys most economically deprived communities, including more than $5 billion to California; andWHEREAS, Nationally, health centers employ more than 200,000 people, including physicians, nurse practitioners, physician assistants, and certified nurse-midwives who work as part of multidisciplinary clinical teams designed to treat the whole patient; andWHEREAS, The health center model continues to be an effective means of overcoming barriers to health care access, including geography, income, and insurance status, and in doing so, improves health care outcomes and reduces health care system costs; andWHEREAS, Health centers reduce overall costs of care by helping manage patients chronic conditions, keeping patients out of more costly health care settings like hospital emergency rooms; andWHEREAS, Health centers are on the front lines of emerging health care crises, providing access to care for our nations veterans, addressing the opioid epidemic, and responding to public health threats in the wake of natural disasters; andWHEREAS, National Health Center Week offers the opportunity to recognize Americas nearly 1,400 health center organizations with over 10,400 service delivery sites, their dedicated staff, board members, patients, and all those responsible for their continued success and growth since the first health centers opened their doors more than 50 years ago; andWHEREAS, During National Health Center Week, Californians will celebrate the legacy of Americas health centers, its 1,300 individual health center sites, and the community health centers vital role in shaping the past, present, and future of Americas health care system; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the week of August 12, 2018, to August 18, 2018, inclusive, as National Health Center Week in California and encourages all Californians to take part in this week by visiting their local health center and celebrating the important partnership between Californias health centers and the communities they serve; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 31, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 27, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 164Introduced by Senator PortantinoAugust 07, 2018 Relative to National Health Center Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 164, Portantino. National Health Center Week.This measure would proclaim the week of August 12, 2018, to August 18, 2018, inclusive, as National Health Center Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For over 50 years, community health centers have delivered value to, and have had a significant impact on, Americas health care system by providing high-quality, affordable, and comprehensive primary and preventive health care in our nations underserved communities; andWHEREAS, As the countrys largest primary care network, health centers are the home for 27 million Americans in over 10,000 communities across the nation. One in every 12 people in the United States and one in every six Californians are served by community health centers; andWHEREAS, Health centers are a critical element of the health care system, serving both rural and urban populations, and often providing the only accessible and dependable source of primary care in their communities. Nationwide, health centers serve one in every six residents of rural areas; andWHEREAS, Every day, health centers develop new approaches to integrating a wide range of services beyond primary care to meet the needs and challenges of their communities, including oral health, vision care, behavioral health, and pharmacy services; andWHEREAS, Health centers are governed by patient-majority boards, ensuring that the patients of each health center are engaged in their own health care decisions; andWHEREAS, Health centers are locally owned and operated small businesses that serve as critical economic engines, helping to power local economies by generating $45.6 billion in economic impact in some of the countrys most economically deprived communities, including more than $5 billion to California; andWHEREAS, Nationally, health centers employ more than 200,000 people, including physicians, nurse practitioners, physician assistants, and certified nurse-midwives who work as part of multidisciplinary clinical teams designed to treat the whole patient; andWHEREAS, The health center model continues to be an effective means of overcoming barriers to health care access, including geography, income, and insurance status, and in doing so, improves health care outcomes and reduces health care system costs; andWHEREAS, Health centers reduce overall costs of care by helping manage patients chronic conditions, keeping patients out of more costly health care settings like hospital emergency rooms; andWHEREAS, Health centers are on the front lines of emerging health care crises, providing access to care for our nations veterans, addressing the opioid epidemic, and responding to public health threats in the wake of natural disasters; andWHEREAS, National Health Center Week offers the opportunity to recognize Americas nearly 1,400 health center organizations with over 10,400 service delivery sites, their dedicated staff, board members, patients, and all those responsible for their continued success and growth since the first health centers opened their doors more than 50 years ago; andWHEREAS, During National Health Center Week, Californians will celebrate the legacy of Americas health centers, its 1,300 individual health center sites, and the community health centers vital role in shaping the past, present, and future of Americas health care system; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the week of August 12, 2018, to August 18, 2018, inclusive, as National Health Center Week in California and encourages all Californians to take part in this week by visiting their local health center and celebrating the important partnership between Californias health centers and the communities they serve; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|