1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 165 CHAPTER 238 Relative to California Firefighter Appreciation Month and California Firefighters Memorial Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 11, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 165, Lara. California Firefighter Appreciation Month and California Firefighters Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim the month of September 2018 as California Firefighter Appreciation Month and September 29, 2018, as California Firefighters Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial, located on the grounds of the State Capitol, serves to honor and commemorate California firefighters who unwaveringly serve our great state with pride, courage, and honor; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is also a symbol of gratitude and appreciation to the men and women of the fire service who put their lives on the line each day to protect the people, property, and beauty of California; and WHEREAS, Each of the over 1,300 names engraved on the brushed limestone walls of the California Firefighters Memorial serves as a timeless tribute to the finest and bravest of our state who have made the ultimate sacrifice as firefighters; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is the only state monument capturing the names in perpetuity of those courageous firefighters in California who have put service to our great State of California above all else; and WHEREAS, Many of the fallen firefighters whose names adorn the California Firefighters Memorial died either under tragic, traumatic circumstances or suffered and ultimately succumbed to job-caused diseases, such as occupational cancer, as a result of the hazardous nature of their work, including routine exposure to toxic chemicals; and WHEREAS, On September 29, 2018, hundreds of firefighters and their families from throughout the state will gather in Sacramento with their fellow Californians for the 16th Annual California Firefighters Memorial Ceremony to honor the men and women of the fire service who have selflessly given their lives to protect California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2018 as California Firefighter Appreciation Month and September 29, 2018, as California Firefighters Memorial Day; and be it further Resolved, That Californians are urged to always remember the firefighters who have given their lives in the line of duty and express their appreciation to those firefighters who continue to protect our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled September 04, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 16, 2018 Passed IN Assembly August 28, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 165Introduced by Senator Lara(Coauthors: Senators Atkins, Dodd, Jackson, and McGuire)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Dahle, Flora, O'Donnell, and Wood)August 08, 2018 Relative to California Firefighter Appreciation Month and California Firefighters Memorial Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 165, Lara. California Firefighter Appreciation Month and California Firefighters Memorial Day.This measure would proclaim the month of September 2018 as California Firefighter Appreciation Month and September 29, 2018, as California Firefighters Memorial Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial, located on the grounds of the State Capitol, serves to honor and commemorate California firefighters who unwaveringly serve our great state with pride, courage, and honor; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is also a symbol of gratitude and appreciation to the men and women of the fire service who put their lives on the line each day to protect the people, property, and beauty of California; and WHEREAS, Each of the over 1,300 names engraved on the brushed limestone walls of the California Firefighters Memorial serves as a timeless tribute to the finest and bravest of our state who have made the ultimate sacrifice as firefighters; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is the only state monument capturing the names in perpetuity of those courageous firefighters in California who have put service to our great State of California above all else; and WHEREAS, Many of the fallen firefighters whose names adorn the California Firefighters Memorial died either under tragic, traumatic circumstances or suffered and ultimately succumbed to job-caused diseases, such as occupational cancer, as a result of the hazardous nature of their work, including routine exposure to toxic chemicals; and WHEREAS, On September 29, 2018, hundreds of firefighters and their families from throughout the state will gather in Sacramento with their fellow Californians for the 16th Annual California Firefighters Memorial Ceremony to honor the men and women of the fire service who have selflessly given their lives to protect California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of September 2018 as California Firefighter Appreciation Month and September 29, 2018, as California Firefighters Memorial Day; and be it further Resolved, That Californians are urged to always remember the firefighters who have given their lives in the line of duty and express their appreciation to those firefighters who continue to protect our families; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|