Senate | 02/23/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 375.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 13). | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 153.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |