California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR19 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19 CHAPTER 23Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 05, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) estimates that about one-half of United States adults over 30 years of age have some form of periodontal disease; andWHEREAS, In California, this number is estimated to range from 46 to 47 percent; andWHEREAS, The CDC reports that periodontitis disproportionately affects ethnic minorities, those of lower socioeconomic status, and those in areas with limited access to dental care, of which California has many; andWHEREAS, Periodontal disease significantly correlates with an increased risk or worsening of many serious medical conditions, including, but not limited to, cardiovascular disease, diabetes, pregnancy complications, metabolic syndrome, Alzheimers disease, and even certain cancers; andWHEREAS, The State Department of Health Care Services recently reduced the Denti-Cal reimbursement rate by almost 60 percent for the ongoing treatment required for people with periodontal disease; andWHEREAS, Research published in the American Journal of Preventive Medicine suggests that the treatment of periodontal disease for those with chronic illnesses resulted in better health outcomes and reduced overall health care spending and inpatient hospital admissions; andWHEREAS, It is vital that policymakers better understand the impact of periodontal disease, especially to aging populations, and the costs associated with allowing the disease to progress; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March of each year as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled April 03, 2017 Passed IN Senate March 16, 2017 Passed IN Assembly March 30, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19Introduced by Senator NguyenFebruary 08, 2017Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) estimates that about one-half of United States adults over 30 years of age have some form of periodontal disease; andWHEREAS, In California, this number is estimated to range from 46 to 47 percent; andWHEREAS, The CDC reports that periodontitis disproportionately affects ethnic minorities, those of lower socioeconomic status, and those in areas with limited access to dental care, of which California has many; andWHEREAS, Periodontal disease significantly correlates with an increased risk or worsening of many serious medical conditions, including, but not limited to, cardiovascular disease, diabetes, pregnancy complications, metabolic syndrome, Alzheimers disease, and even certain cancers; andWHEREAS, The State Department of Health Care Services recently reduced the Denti-Cal reimbursement rate by almost 60 percent for the ongoing treatment required for people with periodontal disease; andWHEREAS, Research published in the American Journal of Preventive Medicine suggests that the treatment of periodontal disease for those with chronic illnesses resulted in better health outcomes and reduced overall health care spending and inpatient hospital admissions; andWHEREAS, It is vital that policymakers better understand the impact of periodontal disease, especially to aging populations, and the costs associated with allowing the disease to progress; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March of each year as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19 CHAPTER 23Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 05, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled April 03, 2017 Passed IN Senate March 16, 2017 Passed IN Assembly March 30, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19Introduced by Senator NguyenFebruary 08, 2017Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled April 03, 2017 Passed IN Senate March 16, 2017 Passed IN Assembly March 30, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled April 03, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate March 16, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly March 30, 2017
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 19
6-CHAPTER 23
14+
15+Introduced by Senator NguyenFebruary 08, 2017
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Nguyen
18+February 08, 2017
719
820 Relative to Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State April 05, 2017. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 19, Nguyen. Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.
1727
1828 This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.
1929
2030 This measure would recognize the month of March as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, The federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) estimates that about one-half of United States adults over 30 years of age have some form of periodontal disease; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, In California, this number is estimated to range from 46 to 47 percent; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, The CDC reports that periodontitis disproportionately affects ethnic minorities, those of lower socioeconomic status, and those in areas with limited access to dental care, of which California has many; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, Periodontal disease significantly correlates with an increased risk or worsening of many serious medical conditions, including, but not limited to, cardiovascular disease, diabetes, pregnancy complications, metabolic syndrome, Alzheimers disease, and even certain cancers; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, The State Department of Health Care Services recently reduced the Denti-Cal reimbursement rate by almost 60 percent for the ongoing treatment required for people with periodontal disease; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, Research published in the American Journal of Preventive Medicine suggests that the treatment of periodontal disease for those with chronic illnesses resulted in better health outcomes and reduced overall health care spending and inpatient hospital admissions; and
3747
3848 WHEREAS, It is vital that policymakers better understand the impact of periodontal disease, especially to aging populations, and the costs associated with allowing the disease to progress; now, therefore, be it
3949
4050 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims March of each year as Periodontal/Gum Disease Awareness Month; and be it further
4151
4252 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.