California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR20 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20 CHAPTER 15 Relative to National Speech and Debate Education Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 14, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, Morrell. National Speech and Debate Education Day.This measure would recognize March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, National Speech and Debate Education Day is being celebrated on March 3, 2017; andWHEREAS, Established by the National Speech and Debate Association in conjunction with local and national partners, this event serves to promote better instruction in speech and debate across all grade levels and to highlight the pivotal roles these abilities play in personal advocacy, social movements, and public policymaking; and WHEREAS, Speech and debate education helps pupils develop important skills in communication, critical thinking, creativity, and collaboration through the practice of public speaking. Participants not only learn to analyze and express complex ideas effectively but also to listen, concur, question, or dissent with reason and compassion; and WHEREAS, Across the country, countless educators devote in-school, after-school, and weekend time to supporting their pupils in speech and debate practices and competitions, and the example of hard work and dedication they set has a lasting and positive impact on their pupils; and WHEREAS, The skills learned through speech and debate serve pupils well throughout their lives, and this occasion presents a welcomed opportunity to recognize this instruction as an essential component of a well-rounded curriculum; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled March 10, 2017 Passed IN Senate February 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly March 09, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20Introduced by Senator MorrellFebruary 13, 2017 Relative to National Speech and Debate Education Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, Morrell. National Speech and Debate Education Day.This measure would recognize March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, National Speech and Debate Education Day is being celebrated on March 3, 2017; andWHEREAS, Established by the National Speech and Debate Association in conjunction with local and national partners, this event serves to promote better instruction in speech and debate across all grade levels and to highlight the pivotal roles these abilities play in personal advocacy, social movements, and public policymaking; and WHEREAS, Speech and debate education helps pupils develop important skills in communication, critical thinking, creativity, and collaboration through the practice of public speaking. Participants not only learn to analyze and express complex ideas effectively but also to listen, concur, question, or dissent with reason and compassion; and WHEREAS, Across the country, countless educators devote in-school, after-school, and weekend time to supporting their pupils in speech and debate practices and competitions, and the example of hard work and dedication they set has a lasting and positive impact on their pupils; and WHEREAS, The skills learned through speech and debate serve pupils well throughout their lives, and this occasion presents a welcomed opportunity to recognize this instruction as an essential component of a well-rounded curriculum; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20 CHAPTER 15 Relative to National Speech and Debate Education Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 14, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, Morrell. National Speech and Debate Education Day.This measure would recognize March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled March 10, 2017 Passed IN Senate February 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly March 09, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20Introduced by Senator MorrellFebruary 13, 2017 Relative to National Speech and Debate Education Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, Morrell. National Speech and Debate Education Day.This measure would recognize March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled March 10, 2017 Passed IN Senate February 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly March 09, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled March 10, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate February 27, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly March 09, 2017
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20
6-CHAPTER 15
14+
15+Introduced by Senator MorrellFebruary 13, 2017
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Morrell
18+February 13, 2017
719
820 Relative to National Speech and Debate Education Day.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State March 14, 2017. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 20, Morrell. National Speech and Debate Education Day.
1727
1828 This measure would recognize March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day.
1929
2030 This measure would recognize March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, National Speech and Debate Education Day is being celebrated on March 3, 2017; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, Established by the National Speech and Debate Association in conjunction with local and national partners, this event serves to promote better instruction in speech and debate across all grade levels and to highlight the pivotal roles these abilities play in personal advocacy, social movements, and public policymaking; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, Speech and debate education helps pupils develop important skills in communication, critical thinking, creativity, and collaboration through the practice of public speaking. Participants not only learn to analyze and express complex ideas effectively but also to listen, concur, question, or dissent with reason and compassion; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, Across the country, countless educators devote in-school, after-school, and weekend time to supporting their pupils in speech and debate practices and competitions, and the example of hard work and dedication they set has a lasting and positive impact on their pupils; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, The skills learned through speech and debate serve pupils well throughout their lives, and this occasion presents a welcomed opportunity to recognize this instruction as an essential component of a well-rounded curriculum; now, therefore, be it
3545
3646 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day; and be it further
3747
3848 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.