Senate | 07/19/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 07/19/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/17/2017 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2066.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (May 15). | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 872.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |