Senate | 04/05/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 27). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 346.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |