Senate | 07/05/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2406.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 376.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |