Senate
|
08/25/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 121, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2017
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2691.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 800.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|