Senate | 05/10/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1398.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 455.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |