Senate | 05/04/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Page 1270.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 663.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |