Senate | 08/24/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2018 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5462.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2018 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6296.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/16/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2995.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | Amendments by Senator Anderson tabled on motion of Senator Monning. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2970.) | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | Amendments by Senator Bates tabled on motion of Senator Monning. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 2969.) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |