Senate | 05/16/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1492.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 875.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |