Senate | 07/12/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2017 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |