California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR42 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 42 CHAPTER 79 Relative to Arab American Heritage Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 07, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 42, Newman. Arab American Heritage Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Arab American Heritage Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For over a century, Arab Americans have been making valuable contributions to virtually every aspect of American society, including medicine, law, business, technology, government, and culture; andWHEREAS, Since migrating to the United States, men and women of Arab descent have shared their rich culture and traditions with neighbors and friends, while also setting fine examples of model citizens and public servants; andWHEREAS, Arab migrants to the United States brought with them their resilient family values, strong work ethic, dedication to education, and diversity in faith and creed that have added strength to our great democracy; andWHEREAS, Arab Americans have also enriched our society by embracing the American spirit of opportunity that makes our nation free and prosperous; andWHEREAS, The history of Arab Americans in American life often remains neglected or defaced by misunderstanding, bigotry, and anti-Arab hate in the form of crimes and speech; andWHEREAS, Issues currently affecting Arab Americans, such as civil rights abuses, harmful stereotyping, harassment, and bullying, must be combated in the forms of education and awareness; andWHEREAS, Arab Americans join all Americans in the desire to see a peaceful and diverse society, where every individual is treated equally and feels safe; andWHEREAS, The immense contributions and heritage of Arab Americans have helped us build a better nation; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That California celebrates the countless contributions that Arab Americans have made to American society and the State of California, and that the Legislature therefore hereby proclaims the month of April 2017 to be Arab American Heritage Month in California and encourages all residents of this state to join in this special observance; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled June 02, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 31, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 42Introduced by Senator Newman(Coauthor: Senator Allen)(Coauthor: Assembly Member Bloom)April 19, 2017 Relative to Arab American Heritage Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 42, Newman. Arab American Heritage Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Arab American Heritage Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For over a century, Arab Americans have been making valuable contributions to virtually every aspect of American society, including medicine, law, business, technology, government, and culture; andWHEREAS, Since migrating to the United States, men and women of Arab descent have shared their rich culture and traditions with neighbors and friends, while also setting fine examples of model citizens and public servants; andWHEREAS, Arab migrants to the United States brought with them their resilient family values, strong work ethic, dedication to education, and diversity in faith and creed that have added strength to our great democracy; andWHEREAS, Arab Americans have also enriched our society by embracing the American spirit of opportunity that makes our nation free and prosperous; andWHEREAS, The history of Arab Americans in American life often remains neglected or defaced by misunderstanding, bigotry, and anti-Arab hate in the form of crimes and speech; andWHEREAS, Issues currently affecting Arab Americans, such as civil rights abuses, harmful stereotyping, harassment, and bullying, must be combated in the forms of education and awareness; andWHEREAS, Arab Americans join all Americans in the desire to see a peaceful and diverse society, where every individual is treated equally and feels safe; andWHEREAS, The immense contributions and heritage of Arab Americans have helped us build a better nation; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That California celebrates the countless contributions that Arab Americans have made to American society and the State of California, and that the Legislature therefore hereby proclaims the month of April 2017 to be Arab American Heritage Month in California and encourages all residents of this state to join in this special observance; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 42 CHAPTER 79 Relative to Arab American Heritage Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 07, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 42, Newman. Arab American Heritage Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Arab American Heritage Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled June 02, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 31, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 42Introduced by Senator Newman(Coauthor: Senator Allen)(Coauthor: Assembly Member Bloom)April 19, 2017 Relative to Arab American Heritage Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 42, Newman. Arab American Heritage Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Arab American Heritage Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled June 02, 2017 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 31, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled June 02, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate April 27, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly May 31, 2017
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 42
6-CHAPTER 79
14+
15+Introduced by Senator Newman(Coauthor: Senator Allen)(Coauthor: Assembly Member Bloom)April 19, 2017
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Newman(Coauthor: Senator Allen)(Coauthor: Assembly Member Bloom)
18+April 19, 2017
719
820 Relative to Arab American Heritage Month.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State June 07, 2017. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 42, Newman. Arab American Heritage Month.
1727
1828 This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Arab American Heritage Month.
1929
2030 This measure would proclaim the month of April 2017 as Arab American Heritage Month.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, For over a century, Arab Americans have been making valuable contributions to virtually every aspect of American society, including medicine, law, business, technology, government, and culture; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, Since migrating to the United States, men and women of Arab descent have shared their rich culture and traditions with neighbors and friends, while also setting fine examples of model citizens and public servants; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, Arab migrants to the United States brought with them their resilient family values, strong work ethic, dedication to education, and diversity in faith and creed that have added strength to our great democracy; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, Arab Americans have also enriched our society by embracing the American spirit of opportunity that makes our nation free and prosperous; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, The history of Arab Americans in American life often remains neglected or defaced by misunderstanding, bigotry, and anti-Arab hate in the form of crimes and speech; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, Issues currently affecting Arab Americans, such as civil rights abuses, harmful stereotyping, harassment, and bullying, must be combated in the forms of education and awareness; and
3747
3848 WHEREAS, Arab Americans join all Americans in the desire to see a peaceful and diverse society, where every individual is treated equally and feels safe; and
3949
4050 WHEREAS, The immense contributions and heritage of Arab Americans have helped us build a better nation; now, therefore, be it
4151
4252 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That California celebrates the countless contributions that Arab Americans have made to American society and the State of California, and that the Legislature therefore hereby proclaims the month of April 2017 to be Arab American Heritage Month in California and encourages all residents of this state to join in this special observance; and be it further
4353
4454 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.