Senate | 07/18/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2541.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1224.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1022.) (May 9). | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |